Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1059 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 5, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 13, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 4, 2021
Analysis May 22, 2021
Analysis May 6, 2021
Analysis April 12, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021
Bill May 10, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 5, 2021
Fiscal Note April 11, 2021