4 | 8 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 9 | | relating to coverage for diagnostic imaging for breast cancer under |
---|
6 | 10 | | certain health benefit plans. |
---|
7 | 11 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 12 | | SECTION 1. The heading to Chapter 1356, Insurance Code, is |
---|
9 | 13 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 14 | | CHAPTER 1356. MAMMOGRAPHY AND OTHER BREAST IMAGING |
---|
11 | 15 | | SECTION 2. Section 1356.001(1-a), Insurance Code, is |
---|
12 | 16 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
13 | 17 | | (1-a) "Diagnostic imaging [mammogram]" means an |
---|
14 | 18 | | imaging examination using mammography, ultrasound imaging, or |
---|
15 | 19 | | magnetic resonance imaging that is designed to evaluate: |
---|
16 | 20 | | (A) a subjective or objective abnormality |
---|
17 | 21 | | detected by a physician or patient in a breast; |
---|
18 | 22 | | (B) an abnormality seen by a physician on a |
---|
19 | 23 | | screening mammogram; |
---|
20 | 24 | | (C) an abnormality previously identified by a |
---|
21 | 25 | | physician as probably benign in a breast for which follow-up |
---|
22 | 26 | | imaging is recommended by a physician; or |
---|
23 | 27 | | (D) an individual with a personal history of |
---|
24 | 28 | | breast cancer or dense breast tissue. |
---|
25 | 29 | | SECTION 3. Section 1356.005(a-1), Insurance Code, is |
---|
26 | 30 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
27 | 31 | | (a-1) A health benefit plan that provides coverage for a |
---|
28 | 32 | | screening mammogram must provide coverage for [a] diagnostic |
---|
29 | 33 | | imaging [mammogram] that is no less favorable than the coverage for |
---|
30 | 34 | | a screening mammogram. |
---|
31 | 35 | | SECTION 4. If before implementing any provision of this Act |
---|
32 | 36 | | a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a |
---|
33 | 37 | | federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision, |
---|
34 | 38 | | the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or |
---|
35 | 39 | | authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the |
---|
36 | 40 | | waiver or authorization is granted. |
---|
37 | 41 | | SECTION 5. The change in law made by this Act applies only |
---|
38 | 42 | | to a health benefit plan that is delivered, issued for delivery, or |
---|
39 | 43 | | renewed on or after January 1, 2022. A health benefit plan that is |
---|
40 | 44 | | delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed before January 1, 2022, |
---|
41 | 45 | | is governed by the law as it existed immediately before the |
---|
42 | 46 | | effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for |
---|
43 | 47 | | that purpose. |
---|
44 | 48 | | SECTION 6. The Texas Department of Insurance, the Employees |
---|
45 | 49 | | Retirement System of Texas, the Teacher Retirement System of Texas, |
---|
46 | 50 | | The University of Texas System, The Texas A&M University System, |
---|
47 | 51 | | and any other state agency or institution subject to this Act are |
---|
48 | 52 | | required to implement a provision of this Act only if the |
---|
49 | 53 | | legislature appropriates money specifically for that purpose. If |
---|
50 | 54 | | the legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that |
---|
51 | 55 | | purpose, those agencies may, but are not required to, implement a |
---|
52 | 56 | | provision of this Act using other appropriations available for that |
---|
53 | 57 | | purpose. |
---|
54 | 58 | | SECTION 7. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
55 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
56 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
57 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1065 passed the Senate on |
---|
58 | | - | April 29, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1; and that |
---|
59 | | - | the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2021, by the |
---|
60 | | - | following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1. |
---|
61 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
62 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
63 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1065 passed the House, with |
---|
64 | | - | amendment, on May 26, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 118, |
---|
65 | | - | Nays 29, two present not voting. |
---|
66 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
67 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
68 | | - | Approved: |
---|
69 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
70 | | - | Date |
---|
71 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
72 | | - | Governor |
---|