Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1071 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 5, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 5, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 31, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 24, 2021
Analysis May 22, 2021
Analysis April 26, 2021
Analysis April 21, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021
Bill April 28, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 21, 2021
Fiscal Note May 15, 2021
Fiscal Note April 27, 2021
Fiscal Note April 26, 2021