Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1093 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 5, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 18, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 26, 2021
Analysis May 4, 2021
Analysis March 25, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 4, 2021
Bill April 1, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 29, 2021