|
05/28/2021
|
Effective on 9/1/21
|
|
|
|
05/28/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/19/2021
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
House passage reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Record vote RV#1090
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Laid out in lieu of companion HB 3902
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2021
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2021
|
Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|