Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB111 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 9, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 31, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 23, 2021
Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis March 31, 2021
Analysis March 17, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2021
Bill April 1, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 14, 2021
Fiscal Note March 31, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021