S.B. No. 1117 AN ACT relating to the composition of the board of directors of the Fort Bend Subsidence District, including a director's qualifications and term. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 8834.051, Special District Local Laws Code, is amended by amending Subsections (a), (e), and (i) and adding Subsection (g-1) to read as follows: (a) The district is governed by a board of 17 [15] directors appointed as provided by this section. (e) The mayor of each of the following municipalities shall appoint a director from the mayor's respective municipality: (1) Houston; (2) Missouri City; (3) Stafford; (4) Sugar Land; (5) Rosenberg; [and] (6) Richmond; and (7) Fulshear. (g-1) The mayors described by Subsections (e) and (g) jointly shall appoint one director who represents the district at large. (i) The directors shall serve staggered terms as follows: (1) five members appointed under Subsection (e) and four members appointed under Subsection (f) shall serve terms expiring on January 1 of odd-numbered years; and (2) two members [one member] appointed under Subsection (e), two members appointed under Subsection (f), one member appointed under Subsection (g), one member appointed under Subsection (g-1), and two members appointed under Subsection (h) shall serve terms expiring on January 1 of even-numbered years. SECTION 2. Not later than November 1, 2021, the appropriate appointing authorities shall appoint members of the board of directors of the Fort Bend Subsidence District as provided by Section 8834.051, Special District Local Laws Code, as amended by this Act. SECTION 3. The Fort Bend Subsidence District retains all the rights, powers, privileges, authority, duties, and functions that it had before the effective date of this Act. SECTION 4. (a) The legal notice of the intention to introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies, officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313, Government Code. (b) The governor, one of the required recipients, has submitted the notice and Act to the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality. (c) The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor, the lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of representatives within the required time. (d) All requirements of the constitution and laws of this state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled and accomplished. SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2021. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1117 passed the Senate on April 19, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1117 passed the House, with amendment, on May 18, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 128, Nays 9, two present not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House Approved: ______________________________ Date ______________________________ Governor