4 | 8 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 9 | | relating to the composition of the board of directors of the Fort |
---|
6 | 10 | | Bend Subsidence District, including a director's qualifications |
---|
7 | 11 | | and term. |
---|
8 | 12 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 13 | | SECTION 1. Section 8834.051, Special District Local Laws |
---|
10 | 14 | | Code, is amended by amending Subsections (a), (e), and (i) and |
---|
11 | 15 | | adding Subsection (g-1) to read as follows: |
---|
12 | 16 | | (a) The district is governed by a board of 17 [15] directors |
---|
13 | 17 | | appointed as provided by this section. |
---|
14 | 18 | | (e) The mayor of each of the following municipalities shall |
---|
15 | 19 | | appoint a director from the mayor's respective municipality: |
---|
16 | 20 | | (1) Houston; |
---|
17 | 21 | | (2) Missouri City; |
---|
18 | 22 | | (3) Stafford; |
---|
19 | 23 | | (4) Sugar Land; |
---|
20 | 24 | | (5) Rosenberg; [and] |
---|
21 | 25 | | (6) Richmond; and |
---|
22 | 26 | | (7) Fulshear. |
---|
23 | 27 | | (g-1) The mayors described by Subsections (e) and (g) |
---|
24 | 28 | | jointly shall appoint one director who represents the district at |
---|
25 | 29 | | large. |
---|
26 | 30 | | (i) The directors shall serve staggered terms as follows: |
---|
27 | 31 | | (1) five members appointed under Subsection (e) and |
---|
28 | 32 | | four members appointed under Subsection (f) shall serve terms |
---|
29 | 33 | | expiring on January 1 of odd-numbered years; and |
---|
30 | 34 | | (2) two members [one member] appointed under |
---|
31 | 35 | | Subsection (e), two members appointed under Subsection (f), one |
---|
32 | 36 | | member appointed under Subsection (g), one member appointed under |
---|
33 | 37 | | Subsection (g-1), and two members appointed under Subsection (h) |
---|
34 | 38 | | shall serve terms expiring on January 1 of even-numbered years. |
---|
35 | 39 | | SECTION 2. Not later than November 1, 2021, the appropriate |
---|
36 | 40 | | appointing authorities shall appoint members of the board of |
---|
37 | 41 | | directors of the Fort Bend Subsidence District as provided by |
---|
38 | 42 | | Section 8834.051, Special District Local Laws Code, as amended by |
---|
39 | 43 | | this Act. |
---|
40 | 44 | | SECTION 3. The Fort Bend Subsidence District retains all |
---|
41 | 45 | | the rights, powers, privileges, authority, duties, and functions |
---|
42 | 46 | | that it had before the effective date of this Act. |
---|
43 | 47 | | SECTION 4. (a) The legal notice of the intention to |
---|
44 | 48 | | introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this |
---|
45 | 49 | | Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a |
---|
46 | 50 | | copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies, |
---|
47 | 51 | | officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished |
---|
48 | 52 | | under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313, |
---|
49 | 53 | | Government Code. |
---|
50 | 54 | | (b) The governor, one of the required recipients, has |
---|
51 | 55 | | submitted the notice and Act to the Texas Commission on |
---|
52 | 56 | | Environmental Quality. |
---|
53 | 57 | | (c) The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed |
---|
54 | 58 | | its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor, the |
---|
55 | 59 | | lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of |
---|
56 | 60 | | representatives within the required time. |
---|
57 | 61 | | (d) All requirements of the constitution and laws of this |
---|
58 | 62 | | state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect |
---|
59 | 63 | | to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled |
---|
60 | 64 | | and accomplished. |
---|
61 | 65 | | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
62 | 66 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
63 | 67 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
64 | 68 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
65 | 69 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
66 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
67 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
68 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1117 passed the Senate on |
---|
69 | | - | April 19, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that |
---|
70 | | - | the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2021, by the |
---|
71 | | - | following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
72 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
73 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
74 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1117 passed the House, with |
---|
75 | | - | amendment, on May 18, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 128, |
---|
76 | | - | Nays 9, two present not voting. |
---|
77 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
78 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
79 | | - | Approved: |
---|
80 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
81 | | - | Date |
---|
82 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
83 | | - | Governor |
---|