Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB112 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 9, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 22, 2021
Analysis May 18, 2021
Analysis March 24, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2021
Bill April 21, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 17, 2021
Fiscal Note May 10, 2021
Fiscal Note March 25, 2021