Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1128 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/08/2021

                            87R448 BEF-D
 By: Powell S.B. No. 1128


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to pollinator health.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 131, Agriculture Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 131.011 and 131.012 to read as follows:
 Sec. 131.011.  POLLINATOR HEALTH EDUCATION. (a)  The Texas
 A&M AgriLife Extension Service, in consultation with the
 department, shall develop educational materials regarding the best
 practices for avoiding adverse effects from pesticides on
 populations of bees and other pollinating insects.  The educational
 materials must include information on measures that pesticide
 applicators may take to protect honeybees and bumblebees.  The
 Texas A&M AgriLife Extension Service and the department shall
 jointly design the requirements to ensure that any pesticide
 applicator applying or supervising the application of a pesticide
 is knowledgeable regarding alternatives to, the appropriateness
 of, and precautions for pesticide use that may be injurious to the
 health of bees and other pollinating insects.
 (b)  The department shall make the educational materials
 described in this section a part of the education required to obtain
 a pesticide applicator license under Chapter 76.
 Sec. 131.012.  TASK FORCE ON POLLINATOR HEALTH. (a)  In this
 section, "task force" means the task force on pollinator health
 established under this section.
 (b)  The task force consists of the following 10 members:
 (1)  one member of the senate, appointed by the
 lieutenant governor after consultation with the speaker of the
 house of representatives, who serves as a nonvoting member of the
 task force;
 (2)  one member of the house of representatives,
 appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives after
 consultation with the lieutenant governor, who is from a different
 political party than the member appointed under Subdivision (1) and
 who serves as a nonvoting member of the task force;
 (3)  one member, appointed by the governor, who is a
 university faculty member specializing in the science of pollinator
 health;
 (4)  one member, appointed by the governor,
 representing an advocacy group for nurseries and greenhouse
 producers;
 (5)  one member, appointed by the governor,
 representing an advocacy group for farmers;
 (6)  one member, appointed by the governor,
 representing an advocacy group dedicated to the protection of
 pollinators and invertebrates;
 (7)  one member, appointed by the governor,
 representing an advocacy group dedicated to environmental
 protection;
 (8)  one member, appointed by the governor,
 representing an advocacy group for retailers;
 (9)  one member, appointed by the governor, who is
 certified as a master gardener by the Texas A&M AgriLife Extension
 Service and who represents the public; and
 (10)  one member, appointed by the governor, who is a
 beekeeper and who represents the public.
 (c)  The task force shall undertake activities to examine
 issues relevant to pollinator health, including:
 (1)  studying proposed and enacted pesticide
 regulations from other states and countries that are more
 protective of pollinator health than the pesticide regulations of
 the United States Environmental Protection Agency;
 (2)  studying public education and outreach plans
 regarding pollinator health that have been successful in other
 states;
 (3)  evaluating the effectiveness of applicator
 licensing and other legal requirements, and of any state or federal
 incentives, in matters affecting pollinator health;
 (4)  identifying possible funding streams for efforts
 to promote or protect pollinator health;
 (5)  investigating the means used by other states to
 gather data on populations of bees or other pollinating insects;
 and
 (6)  evaluating existing best management practices for
 applying neonicotinoids in a manner that avoids harming pollinating
 insects.
 (d)  The task force may take actions necessary and proper to
 carry out the work of the task force, including scheduling hearings
 and taking testimony on matters related to pollinator health.
 (e)  A majority of the voting members of the task force
 constitutes a quorum for the transaction of business.
 (f)  Official action by the task force requires the approval
 of five or more voting members of the task force.
 (g)  The task force shall elect one of its voting members to
 serve as presiding officer.
 (h)  The appropriate appointing officer shall appoint a
 qualified person to fill a vacancy on the task force.
 (i)  The task force shall meet at times and places specified
 by the call of the presiding officer or of a majority of the voting
 members of the task force.
 (j)  The task force may adopt bylaws necessary for the
 operation of the task force.
 (k)  Not later than October 1, 2022, the task force shall
 submit a report, which may include recommendations for legislation,
 to the standing committees of the senate and the house of
 representatives with primary jurisdiction over agriculture. The
 task force may provide progress reports to those committees before
 October 1, 2022.
 (l)  The department shall provide staff support to the task
 force.
 (m)  Members of the task force who are not members of the
 legislature are not entitled to compensation but may be reimbursed
 for actual and necessary travel and other expenses incurred in the
 performance of their official duties in the manner and amounts
 provided for in the General Appropriations Act.
 (n)  Each state agency shall assist the task force in the
 performance of its duties and, to the extent permitted by laws
 relating to confidentiality, shall furnish information and advice
 that the members of the task force consider necessary to perform
 their duties.
 (o)  This section expires December 31, 2022.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than October 1, 2021, the relevant
 appointing authorities shall appoint the members of the task force
 on pollinator health under Section 131.012(b), Agriculture Code, as
 added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.