4 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 7 | | relating to a study on streamlining public safety net programs to |
---|
6 | 8 | | reduce costs and improve outcomes for recipients under the |
---|
7 | 9 | | programs. |
---|
8 | 10 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 11 | | SECTION 1. DEFINITIONS. In this Act: |
---|
10 | 12 | | (1) "Board" means the Legislative Budget Board. |
---|
11 | 13 | | (2) "Safety net program" means any needs-based state |
---|
12 | 14 | | or federal program that provides food, medical, or financial |
---|
13 | 15 | | assistance to a recipient under the program, including: |
---|
14 | 16 | | (A) the child health plan program under Chapter |
---|
15 | 17 | | 62, Health and Safety Code; |
---|
16 | 18 | | (B) the financial assistance program under |
---|
17 | 19 | | Chapter 31, Human Resources Code; |
---|
18 | 20 | | (C) the medical assistance program under Chapter |
---|
19 | 21 | | 32, Human Resources Code; |
---|
20 | 22 | | (D) the supplemental nutrition assistance |
---|
21 | 23 | | program under Chapter 33, Human Resources Code; |
---|
22 | 24 | | (E) the federal special supplemental nutrition |
---|
23 | 25 | | program for women, infants, and children authorized by 42 U.S.C. |
---|
24 | 26 | | Section 1786; |
---|
25 | 27 | | (F) the Comprehensive Energy Assistance Program |
---|
26 | 28 | | administered by the Texas Department of Housing and Community |
---|
27 | 29 | | Affairs in accordance with the federal Low-Income Home Energy |
---|
28 | 30 | | Assistance Act of 1981 (42 U.S.C. Section 8621 et seq.); and |
---|
29 | 31 | | (G) the child care services program operated by |
---|
30 | 32 | | the Texas Workforce Commission. |
---|
31 | 33 | | SECTION 2. STUDY OF SAFETY NET PROGRAMS. (a) The board, in |
---|
32 | 34 | | coordination with the Health and Human Services Commission and |
---|
33 | 35 | | other applicable state agencies, shall conduct a study on safety |
---|
34 | 36 | | net programs available in this state during the five-year period |
---|
35 | 37 | | preceding the effective date of this Act for the purposes of: |
---|
36 | 38 | | (1) streamlining program eligibility requirements, |
---|
37 | 39 | | resources, and benefits; |
---|
38 | 40 | | (2) improving outcomes for recipients under the |
---|
39 | 41 | | programs; and |
---|
40 | 42 | | (3) reducing costs to taxpayers. |
---|
41 | 43 | | (b) The study must include: |
---|
42 | 44 | | (1) an examination of: |
---|
43 | 45 | | (A) the total amount of: |
---|
44 | 46 | | (i) taxpayer revenue spent per safety net |
---|
45 | 47 | | program; |
---|
46 | 48 | | (ii) state money appropriated per program; |
---|
47 | 49 | | and |
---|
48 | 50 | | (iii) federal money received per program; |
---|
49 | 51 | | (B) benefits provided under each program; |
---|
50 | 52 | | (C) the number of recipients enrolled in or |
---|
51 | 53 | | otherwise receiving benefits under each program; |
---|
52 | 54 | | (D) aggregate demographic and socioeconomic |
---|
53 | 55 | | information on recipients under each program including information |
---|
54 | 56 | | relating to: |
---|
55 | 57 | | (i) the average household income of |
---|
56 | 58 | | recipients under each program; |
---|
57 | 59 | | (ii) the employment status of recipients |
---|
58 | 60 | | or, if recipients are dependents, the parents or guardians of |
---|
59 | 61 | | recipients, under each program; |
---|
60 | 62 | | (iii) the marital status of recipients or, |
---|
61 | 63 | | if recipients are dependents, the parents or guardians of |
---|
62 | 64 | | recipients, under each program; and |
---|
63 | 65 | | (iv) the average number of dependents in |
---|
64 | 66 | | recipient households under each program; |
---|
65 | 67 | | (E) duplicative services and administrative |
---|
66 | 68 | | activities among programs; |
---|
67 | 69 | | (F) the percentage of state money appropriated to |
---|
68 | 70 | | each program that is directly spent on providing benefits to |
---|
69 | 71 | | recipients under the program and the percentage that is spent on |
---|
70 | 72 | | staff and other administrative costs; |
---|
71 | 73 | | (G) the percentage of recipients who become |
---|
72 | 74 | | ineligible for each program because the recipient no longer meets |
---|
73 | 75 | | the income eligibility requirements; |
---|
74 | 76 | | (H) the number of individuals who begin, but do |
---|
75 | 77 | | not complete, an application for benefits under each program and a |
---|
76 | 78 | | statement of that number as a percentage of the overall number of |
---|
77 | 79 | | recipients under each program; |
---|
78 | 80 | | (I) the rate at which former recipients of each |
---|
79 | 81 | | program later reapply for benefits under the program; and |
---|
80 | 82 | | (J) the average length of time between an initial |
---|
81 | 83 | | application for benefits and approval under each program; |
---|
82 | 84 | | (2) a cost-benefit analysis that compares the costs of |
---|
83 | 85 | | providing each program with the program's effectiveness at |
---|
84 | 86 | | transitioning recipients to self-sufficiency; and |
---|
85 | 87 | | (3) a statistical analysis of the data collected under |
---|
86 | 88 | | Subdivisions (1) and (2). |
---|
87 | 89 | | (c) The board shall collect any information necessary to |
---|
88 | 90 | | conduct the study from each state agency that administers or |
---|
89 | 91 | | operates a safety net program. At the request of the board, each |
---|
90 | 92 | | agency shall submit the requested information to the board within a |
---|
91 | 93 | | reasonable time, as prescribed by the board. |
---|
92 | 94 | | (d) The board shall conduct the study and prepare the report |
---|
93 | 95 | | required by Section 3 of this Act using existing resources. |
---|
94 | 96 | | SECTION 3. REPORT ON SAFETY NET PROGRAMS. Not later than |
---|
95 | 97 | | September 1, 2022, the board shall: |
---|
96 | 98 | | (1) submit a report on the board's findings and |
---|
97 | 99 | | recommendations to the legislature, including recommendations on |
---|
98 | 100 | | how to: |
---|
99 | 101 | | (A) simplify and streamline each safety net |
---|
100 | 102 | | program; |
---|
101 | 103 | | (B) improve outcomes of each program; and |
---|
102 | 104 | | (C) lower costs to taxpayers for safety net |
---|
103 | 105 | | programs; and |
---|
104 | 106 | | (2) post the report on the board's Internet website. |
---|
105 | 107 | | SECTION 4. EXPIRATION. This Act expires January 1, 2023. |
---|
106 | 108 | | SECTION 5. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect |
---|
107 | 109 | | immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members |
---|
108 | 110 | | elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas |
---|
109 | 111 | | Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for |
---|
110 | 112 | | immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
111 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
112 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
113 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1138 passed the Senate on |
---|
114 | | - | April 27, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; |
---|
115 | | - | May 25, 2021, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and |
---|
116 | | - | requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 27, 2021, House |
---|
117 | | - | granted request of the Senate; May 30, 2021, Senate adopted |
---|
118 | | - | Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31, |
---|
119 | | - | Nays 0. |
---|
120 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
121 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
122 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1138 passed the House, with |
---|
123 | | - | amendments, on May 13, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 89, |
---|
124 | | - | Nays 57, two present not voting; May 27, 2021, House granted |
---|
125 | | - | request of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee; |
---|
126 | | - | May 29, 2021, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the |
---|
127 | | - | following vote: Yeas 85, Nays 53, one present not voting. |
---|
128 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
129 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
130 | | - | Approved: |
---|
131 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
132 | | - | Date |
---|
133 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
134 | | - | Governor |
---|