Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1146 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 8, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 6, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 2, 2021