Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1168 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 8, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 23, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 28, 2021
Analysis May 13, 2021
Analysis April 2, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 13, 2021
Bill April 14, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 5, 2021