Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1171 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 8, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 5, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2021
Bill April 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis April 30, 2021
Analysis March 23, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 30, 2021
Fiscal Note March 24, 2021