Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1178 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 9, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 21, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 20, 2021
Fiscal Note April 1, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 20, 2021
Analysis April 5, 2021