Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1193 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 9, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 29, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 28, 2021
Fiscal Note April 20, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 26, 2021
Analysis April 19, 2021