Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB12 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 1, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 1, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2021
Bill March 22, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 19, 2021
Analysis March 16, 2021
Analysis March 5, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 12, 2021
Fiscal Note May 5, 2021
Fiscal Note March 19, 2021
Fiscal Note March 7, 2021