Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1212 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 9, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 3, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 26, 2021
Analysis April 28, 2021
Analysis March 26, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 28, 2021
Bill April 8, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 28, 2021