Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1226 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/07/2021

                    By: Schwertner S.B. No. 1226
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2021; March 18, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 April 7, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 7, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1226 By:  Schwertner


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authorized activities of a holder of a brewpub
 license.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 74.01, Alcoholic Beverage Code, as
 effective September 1, 2021, is amended by amending Subsection (a)
 and adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a)  A holder of a brewpub license for a brewpub located in a
 wet area, as that term is described by Section 251.71, may:
 (1)  brew, bottle, can, package, and label malt
 beverages;
 (2)  sell or offer without charge, on the premises of
 the brewpub, to ultimate consumers for consumption on or off those
 premises, malt beverages produced by the holder, in or from a lawful
 container, to the extent the sales or offers are allowed under the
 holder's other permits or licenses; [and]
 (3)  sell food on the premises of the holder's
 breweries; and
 (4)  conduct samplings of malt beverages, including
 tastings, at a retailer's premises.
 (a-1)  An agent or employee of the holder of a brewpub
 license may open, touch, or pour malt beverages, make a
 presentation, or answer questions at a sampling event.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *