Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1235 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/01/2021

                            By: Hughes, Springer S.B. No. 1235
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2021; March 18, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 1, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 3; April 1, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to verification of the accuracy of voter registration
 applications and voter registration lists.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 18.068, Election Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 18.068.  COMPARISON OF INFORMATION REGARDING
 INELIGIBILITY. (a)  The secretary of state shall quarterly compare
 the information received under Section 16.001 of this code and
 Section 62.113, Government Code, to the statewide computerized
 voter registration list.
 (a-1)  The secretary of state shall enter into an agreement
 with the Department of Public Safety under which information in the
 statewide computerized voter registration list is compared against
 information in the database of the Department of Public Safety on a
 monthly basis to verify the accuracy of information provided on
 voter registration applications. The information compared must
 include, at a minimum, a voter's:
 (1)  full legal name;
 (2)  former name, if applicable;
 (3)  date of birth;
 (4)  residence address;
 (5)  driver's license or state identification card
 number;
 (6)  signature;
 (7)  social security number;
 (8)  documentation of lawful presence in this state;
 and
 (9)  citizenship status.
 (a-2)  If the secretary determines from information received
 under Subsection (a) or (a-1) that a voter on the registration list
 may be ineligible to vote [is deceased or has been excused or
 disqualified from jury service because the voter is not a citizen],
 the secretary shall send notice of the determination to the voter
 registrar of the counties considered appropriate by the secretary.
 (b)  The secretary of state shall by rule determine what
 information combinations identified as common to a voter and to an
 individual who is deceased or ineligible to vote constitute a weak
 match or a strong match in order to:
 (1)  produce the least possible impact on Texas voters;
 and
 (2)  fulfill its responsibility to manage the voter
 rolls.
 (c)  The secretary of state may not determine that a voter is
 deceased or ineligible to vote based on a weak match.  The
 secretary of state may inform the county of the voter's residence
 that a weak match exists.
 (d)  On receiving notification from the secretary of state
 under Subsection (c) that a weak match of identifying information
 exists for a county voter and an individual who is deceased or
 ineligible to vote, the county shall investigate whether the voter
 is that [the] individual [who is deceased].
 (e)  The secretary of state may determine that a voter is
 deceased or ineligible to vote based on a strong match.
 (f)  The secretary of state may obtain, for purposes of
 determining whether a voter is deceased or ineligible to vote,
 information from other state agency databases relating to a voter
 that is the same type of information that the secretary of state or
 a voter registrar collects or stores for voter registration
 purposes.
 (g)  Not later than December 31 of each year, the secretary
 of state shall provide a report to the legislature of the number of
 voters determined to be ineligible under this section during the
 calendar year. The report must include the reason for
 ineligibility for each voter.
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 an application to register to vote submitted on or after the
 effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *