Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1245 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/20/2021

                            S.B. No. 1245


 AN ACT
 relating to the farm and ranch survey conducted by the comptroller
 for purposes of estimating the productivity value of qualified
 open-space land as part of the study of school district taxable
 values.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter M, Chapter 403, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 403.3022 to read as follows:
 Sec. 403.3022.  FARM AND RANCH SURVEY. (a) The comptroller
 shall conduct an annual farm and ranch survey for purposes of
 estimating the productivity value of qualified open-space land as
 part of a study under Section 403.302.
 (b)  The comptroller shall prepare and issue an
 instructional guide that provides information to assist
 individuals in completing the farm and ranch survey. The
 instructional guide must include:
 (1)  definitions of words related to property appraisal
 in the survey;
 (2)  instructions and examples regarding how to answer
 the questions in the survey;
 (3)  answers to frequently asked questions; and
 (4)  any other information the comptroller determines
 is necessary to assist individuals in completing the survey.
 (c)  At least once each year, the comptroller shall conduct
 an online or in-person informational session that is open to the
 public regarding how to complete the farm and ranch survey. The
 comptroller shall post a recording of the informational session on
 the comptroller's Internet website.
 (d)  At least once each year, the comptroller shall solicit
 comments from the public and the property tax administration
 advisory board for the purposes of:
 (1)  determining the ease and understandability of the
 farm and ranch survey; and
 (2)  ensuring that the questions in the survey are
 designed to generate reliable answers.
 (e)  The chief appraiser of each appraisal district shall
 distribute the farm and ranch survey instructional guide to the
 members of the agricultural advisory board for the appraisal
 district appointed under Section 6.12, Tax Code, and shall provide
 information to the board regarding how to access the informational
 session provided under Subsection (c) of this section. The chief
 appraiser may distribute the instructional guide electronically
 under this subsection.
 (f)  The comptroller shall distribute the farm and ranch
 survey instructional guide to individuals who receive the farm and
 ranch survey from the comptroller and shall provide information to
 those individuals regarding how to access the informational session
 provided under Subsection (c). The comptroller may distribute the
 instructional guide electronically under this subsection.
 (g)  The definitions of words related to property appraisal
 included in the instructional guide are for informational purposes
 only and do not apply to this code or the Tax Code.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than January 1, 2022, the comptroller
 shall prepare and issue the instructional guide required by Section
 403.3022, Government Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1245 passed the Senate on
 April 20, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1245 passed the House on
 May 20, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 141, Nays 2, one
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor