Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1254 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 9, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 12, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2021
Bill April 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis April 30, 2021
Analysis April 1, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 29, 2021
Fiscal Note April 6, 2021