Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1258 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 9, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 7, 2021
Analysis May 18, 2021
Analysis April 22, 2021
Analysis April 6, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2021
Bill April 26, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 17, 2021
Fiscal Note April 25, 2021
Fiscal Note April 8, 2021