Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1259 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/23/2021

                    By: Birdwell S.B. No. 1259
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2021; March 18, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources &
 Economic Development; April 23, 2021, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:   Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 23, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1259 By:  Birdwell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to causes of action for withholding payments of the
 proceeds from the sale of oil and gas production.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 91.402, Natural Resources Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  A payee does not have a common law cause of action for
 breach of contract against a payor for withholding royalty payments
 under Subsection (b) unless, for a dispute concerning the title,
 the contract requiring payment specifies otherwise.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an action filed on or after the effective date of this Act. An
 action filed before the effective date of this Act is governed by
 the law applicable to the action immediately before the effective
 date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *