Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1259 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 9, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 11, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 26, 2021
Analysis May 5, 2021
Analysis April 22, 2021
Analysis April 6, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 5, 2021
Bill April 23, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 4, 2021
Fiscal Note April 22, 2021
Fiscal Note April 2, 2021