Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1265 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/21/2021

                    By: Birdwell S.B. No. 1265
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2021; March 18, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources &
 Economic Development; April 21, 2021, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 21, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the eligibility of the National Hot Rod Association
 Fall Nationals at the Texas Motorplex for funding under the Major
 Events Reimbursement Program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 478.0001(3) and (7), Government Code,
 as effective April 1, 2021, are amended to read as follows:
 (3)  "Event" means any of the following and includes
 any activity related to or associated with the following:
 (A)  the Academy of Country Music Awards;
 (B)  the Amateur Athletic Union Junior Olympic
 Games;
 (C)  the Breeders' Cup World Championships;
 (D)  a game of the College Football Playoff or its
 successor;
 (E)  an Elite Rodeo Association World
 Championship;
 (F)  a Formula One automobile race;
 (G)  the largest event held each year at a sports
 entertainment venue in this state with a permanent seating
 capacity, including grandstand and premium seating, of at least
 125,000;
 (H)  the Major League Baseball All-Star Game;
 (I)  the Major League Soccer All-Star Game or the
 Major League Soccer Cup;
 (J)  a mixed martial arts championship;
 (K)  the Moto Grand Prix of the United States;
 (L)  the National Association for Stock Car Auto
 Racing (NASCAR):
 (i)  All-Star Race; or
 (ii)  season-ending Championship Race;
 (M)  the National Basketball Association All-Star
 Game;
 (N)  a National Collegiate Athletic Association
 Final Four tournament game;
 (O)  the National Collegiate Athletic Association
 men's or women's lacrosse championships;
 (P)  a national collegiate championship of an
 amateur sport sanctioned by the national governing body of the
 sport that is recognized by the United States Olympic Committee;
 (Q)  the National Cutting Horse Association
 Triple Crown;
 (R)  the National Hockey League All-Star Game;
 (S)  the National Hot Rod Association Fall
 Nationals at the Texas Motorplex;
 (T)  a national political convention of the
 Republican National Committee or the Democratic National
 Committee;
 (U) [(T)]  an Olympic activity, including a
 Junior or Senior activity, training program, or feeder program
 sanctioned by the United States Olympic Committee's Community
 Olympic Development Program;
 (V) [(U)]  a presidential general election
 debate;
 (W) [(V)]  the Professional Rodeo Cowboys
 Association National Finals Rodeo;
 (X) [(W)]  a Super Bowl;
 (Y) [(X)]  the United States Open Championship;
 (Z) [(Y)]  a World Cup soccer game or the World
 Cup soccer tournament;
 (AA) [(Z)]  the World Games; or
 (BB) [(AA)]  the X Games.
 (7)  "Site selection organization" means:
 (A)  the Academy of Country Music;
 (B)  the Amateur Athletic Union;
 (C)  the College Football Playoff Administration,
 LLC, or its successor;
 (D)  the Commission on Presidential Debates;
 (E)  the Democratic National Committee;
 (F)  Dorna Sports;
 (G)  the Elite Rodeo Association;
 (H)  ESPN or an affiliate;
 (I)  the Federation Internationale de Football
 Association (FIFA);
 (J)  the International World Games Association;
 (K)  Major League Baseball;
 (L)  Major League Soccer;
 (M)  the National Association for Stock Car Auto
 Racing (NASCAR);
 (N)  the National Basketball Association;
 (O)  the National Collegiate Athletic
 Association;
 (P)  the National Cutting Horse Association;
 (Q)  the National Football League;
 (R)  the National Hockey League;
 (S)  the National Hot Rod Association;
 (T)  the Professional Rodeo Cowboys Association;
 (U) [(T)]  the Republican National Committee;
 (V) [(U)]  the Ultimate Fighting Championship;
 (W) [(V)]  the United States Golf Association;
 (X) [(W)]  the United States Olympic Committee;
 or
 (Y) [(X)]  the national governing body of a sport
 that is recognized by:
 (i)  the Federation Internationale de
 l'Automobile;
 (ii)  Formula One Management Limited;
 (iii)  the National Thoroughbred Racing
 Association; or
 (iv)  the United States Olympic Committee.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *