1 | | - | By: Taylor, Zaffirini S.B. No. 1266 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Taylor S.B. No. 1266 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2021; March 18, 2021, read |
---|
| 3 | + | first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources & |
---|
| 4 | + | Economic Development; April 21, 2021, reported favorably by the |
---|
| 5 | + | following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 21, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
2 | 7 | | |
---|
3 | 8 | | |
---|
4 | 9 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
5 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
6 | 11 | | relating to the feasibility of creating and maintaining a coastal |
---|
7 | 12 | | barrier system. |
---|
8 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 14 | | SECTION 1. (a) The legislature shall establish a joint |
---|
10 | 15 | | interim committee to continue to study the implementation of a |
---|
11 | 16 | | coastal barrier system in this state that includes a series of gates |
---|
12 | 17 | | and barriers to prevent storm surge damage to gulf beaches or |
---|
13 | 18 | | coastal ports, industry, or property. |
---|
14 | 19 | | (b) The committee is composed of: |
---|
15 | 20 | | (1) the members of the standing committee of the |
---|
16 | 21 | | senate that has primary jurisdiction over natural resources; |
---|
17 | 22 | | (2) the members of the standing committee of the house |
---|
18 | 23 | | of representatives that has primary jurisdiction over land and |
---|
19 | 24 | | resource management; |
---|
20 | 25 | | (3) two members of the senate appointed by the |
---|
21 | 26 | | lieutenant governor, each of whom represents a district in a county |
---|
22 | 27 | | that borders the Gulf of Mexico; and |
---|
23 | 28 | | (4) two members of the house of representatives |
---|
24 | 29 | | appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives, each of |
---|
25 | 30 | | whom represents a district in a county that borders the Gulf of |
---|
26 | 31 | | Mexico. |
---|
27 | 32 | | (c) The lieutenant governor and the speaker of the house of |
---|
28 | 33 | | representatives shall jointly designate a chair or, alternatively, |
---|
29 | 34 | | designate two co-chairs from among the committee membership. |
---|
30 | 35 | | (d) The committee may adopt rules necessary to carry out the |
---|
31 | 36 | | committee's duties under this section. |
---|
32 | 37 | | (e) Not later than December 1, 2022, the committee shall |
---|
33 | 38 | | report to the governor and the legislature the findings of the study |
---|
34 | 39 | | and any recommendations developed by the committee under this |
---|
35 | 40 | | section. |
---|
36 | 41 | | (f) The committee is abolished and this Act expires January |
---|
37 | 42 | | 9, 2023. |
---|
38 | 43 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
39 | 44 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
40 | 45 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
41 | 46 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
42 | 47 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|