Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1277 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 9, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 18, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 25, 2021
Analysis May 10, 2021
Analysis April 17, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2021
Bill April 23, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 16, 2021