Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1278 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Hancock S.B. No. 1278
2+ (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2021; March 18, 2021, read
3+ first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
4+ April 7, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
5+ Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 2; April 7, 2021,
6+ sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1278 By: Hancock
29
310
411 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
512 AN ACT
613 relating to the responsibility for ancillary services costs
714 incurred for the operation of intermittent generation resources.
815 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
916 SECTION 1. Section 35.004(e), Utilities Code, is amended to
1017 read as follows:
1118 (e) The commission shall ensure that ancillary services
1219 necessary to facilitate the transmission of electric energy are
1320 available at reasonable prices with terms and conditions that are
1421 not unreasonably preferential, prejudicial, discriminatory,
15- predatory, or anticompetitive. The commission shall require,
16- consistent with cost-causation principles, intermittent generation
17- resources in the ERCOT power region to purchase ancillary services
18- and replacement power sufficient to manage net load variability.
19- In this subsection, "ancillary services" means services necessary
20- to facilitate the transmission of electric energy including load
21- following, standby power, backup power, reactive power, and any
22- other services as the commission may determine by rule. On the
23- introduction of customer choice in the ERCOT power region,
24- acquisition of generation-related ancillary services on a
25- nondiscriminatory basis by the independent organization in ERCOT on
26- behalf of entities selling electricity at retail shall be deemed to
27- meet the requirements of this subsection.
22+ predatory, or anticompetitive. The commission shall require
23+ intermittent generation resources in the ERCOT power region to
24+ purchase ancillary services and replacement power sufficient to
25+ manage net load variability. In this subsection, "ancillary
26+ services" means services necessary to facilitate the transmission
27+ of electric energy including load following, standby power, backup
28+ power, reactive power, and any other services as the commission may
29+ determine by rule. On the introduction of customer choice in the
30+ ERCOT power region, acquisition of generation-related ancillary
31+ services on a nondiscriminatory basis by the independent
32+ organization in ERCOT on behalf of entities selling electricity at
33+ retail shall be deemed to meet the requirements of this subsection.
2834 SECTION 2. The Public Utility Commission of Texas shall
2935 adopt any rules required to implement Section 35.004(e), Utilities
30- Code, as amended by this Act, not later than January 1, 2022. The
31- commission shall ensure that the rules do not unreasonably impede
32- or impair performance under contracts entered into before the
33- effective date of this Act.
36+ Code, as amended by this Act, not later than January 1, 2022.
3437 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
38+ * * * * *