Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1280 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 9, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 3, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 24, 2021
Analysis April 27, 2021
Analysis March 27, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 27, 2021
Bill March 31, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 22, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021