Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1281 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/09/2021

                    By: Hancock S.B. No. 1281
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2021; March 18, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 April 9, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 9, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1281 By:  Hancock


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certificates of public convenience and necessity for
 certain transmission projects.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 37.052, Utilities Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  An electric utility is not required to amend the
 utility's certificate of public convenience and necessity to
 construct a transmission line that connects the utility's existing
 transmission facilities to a load-serving substation or metering
 point if:
 (1)  the transmission line does not exceed three miles
 in length;
 (2)  each landowner whose property would be directly
 affected by the transmission line, as provided by commission rules,
 provides written consent for the transmission line; and
 (3)  all rights-of-way necessary for construction of
 the transmission line have been purchased.
 SECTION 2.  Section 37.056(d), Utilities Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (d)  The commission by rule shall establish criteria, in
 addition to the criteria described by Subsection (c), for granting
 a certificate for a transmission project that serves the ERCOT
 power region, that is not necessary to meet state or federal
 reliability standards, and that is not included in a plan developed
 under Section 39.904(g) [does not serve a competitive renewable
 energy zone]. The criteria must include a comparison of the
 estimated cost of the transmission project for consumers and the
 estimated cost savings for consumers that may result from the
 transmission project. The commission shall include with its
 decision on an application for a certificate to which this
 subsection applies findings on the criteria.
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a proceeding affecting a certificate of public convenience and
 necessity that commences on or after the effective date of this Act.
 A proceeding affecting a certificate of public convenience and
 necessity that commenced before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the proceeding is
 commenced, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *