Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1281 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/31/2021

                            S.B. No. 1281


 AN ACT
 relating to a reliability assessment of the ERCOT power grid and
 certificates of public convenience and necessity for certain
 transmission projects.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 37.052, Utilities Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  An electric utility is not required to amend the
 utility's certificate of public convenience and necessity to
 construct a transmission line that connects the utility's existing
 transmission facilities to a substation or metering point if:
 (1)  the transmission line does not exceed:
 (A)  three miles in length, if the line connects
 to a load-serving substation or metering point; or
 (B)  two miles in length, if the line connects to a
 generation substation or metering point;
 (2)  each landowner whose property would be directly
 affected by the transmission line, as provided by commission rules,
 provides written consent for the transmission line; and
 (3)  all rights-of-way necessary for construction of
 the transmission line have been purchased.
 SECTION 2.  Section 37.056, Utilities Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c-1) and amending Subsection (d) to read as
 follows:
 (c-1)  In considering the need for additional service under
 Subsection (c)(2) for a reliability transmission project that
 serves the ERCOT power region, the commission must consider the
 historical load, forecasted load growth, and additional load
 currently seeking interconnection.
 (d)  The commission by rule shall establish criteria, in
 addition to the criteria described by Subsection (c), for granting
 a certificate for a transmission project that serves the ERCOT
 power region, that is not necessary to meet state or federal
 reliability standards, and that is not included in a plan developed
 under Section 39.904(g) [does not serve a competitive renewable
 energy zone]. The criteria must include a comparison of the
 estimated cost of the transmission project for consumers and the
 estimated congestion cost savings for consumers that may result
 from the transmission project, considering both current and future
 expected congestion levels and the transmission project's ability
 to reduce those congestion levels. The commission shall include
 with its decision on an application for a certificate to which this
 subsection applies findings on the criteria.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter D, Chapter 39, Utilities Code, is
 amended by adding Section 39.159 to read as follows:
 Sec. 39.159.  GRID RELIABILITY ASSESSMENT. (a)  The
 independent organization certified under Section 39.151 for the
 ERCOT power region shall conduct a biennial assessment of the ERCOT
 power grid to assess the grid's reliability in extreme weather
 scenarios.
 (b)  Each assessment must:
 (1)  consider the impact of different levels of thermal
 and renewable generation availability; and
 (2)  recommend transmission projects that may increase
 the grid's reliability in extreme weather scenarios.
 SECTION 4.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a proceeding affecting a certificate of public convenience and
 necessity that commences on or after the effective date of this Act.
 A proceeding affecting a certificate of public convenience and
 necessity that commenced before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the proceeding is
 commenced, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1281 passed the Senate on
 April 19, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0;
 May 28, 2021, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 28, 2021, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 30, 2021, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 31,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1281 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 26, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 142,
 Nays 1, two present not voting; May 28, 2021, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 30, 2021, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 137, Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor