S.B. No. 1308 AN ACT relating to a study on the impacts of using certain motor vehicle technologies. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. STUDY. (a) In this section: (1) "Automated driving system" has the meaning assigned by Section 545.451, Transportation Code. (2) "Connected driving system" means hardware and software that, when installed on a motor vehicle and engaged, allow the vehicle to electronically communicate with other vehicles and transportation infrastructure. (b) The Texas Department of Transportation and the Department of Public Safety of the State of Texas, in consultation with the Texas A&M Transportation Institute and the appropriate federal agencies, shall jointly conduct a study on: (1) the potential benefits of using automated driving systems, connected driving systems, and other emerging technologies to alleviate motor vehicle traffic congestion at ports of entry between this state and the United Mexican States; and (2) the overall impact of using automated driving systems, connected driving systems, and other emerging technologies on the transportation industry workforce and the broader Texas economy, including the effects on driver and public safety. (c) Not later than January 1, 2023, the Texas Department of Transportation and the Department of Public Safety of the State of Texas shall jointly submit to the governor, the lieutenant governor, and the legislature a report on the results of the study conducted under this section. SECTION 2. EXPIRATION DATE. This Act expires September 1, 2023. SECTION 3. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2021. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1308 passed the Senate on April 9, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; May 25, 2021, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 27, 2021, House granted request of the Senate; May 29, 2021, Senate adopted Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1308 passed the House, with amendments, on May 18, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 109, Nays 28, two present not voting; May 27, 2021, House granted request of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee; May 29, 2021, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 102, Nays 37, two present not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House Approved: ______________________________ Date ______________________________ Governor