Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1338 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 11, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 27, 2021
Analysis April 30, 2021
Analysis March 26, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 4, 2021
Fiscal Note March 28, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 30, 2021
Bill April 8, 2021