Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1341 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 7, 2021
Analysis May 18, 2021
Analysis April 12, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2021
Bill April 20, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 11, 2021