Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1349 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 20, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 19, 2021
Fiscal Note April 11, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 19, 2021
Analysis April 12, 2021