Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1368 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 03/31/2021

                            By: Creighton S.B. No. 1368
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2021; March 18, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 March 31, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; March 31, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the limitations periods for certain suits against real
 estate appraisers and appraisal firms.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 16, Civil Practice and
 Remedies Code, is amended by adding Section 16.013 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 16.013.  REAL ESTATE APPRAISERS AND APPRAISAL FIRMS.
 (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Appraisal" has the meaning assigned by Section
 1103.003, Occupations Code.
 (2)  "Appraisal review" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 1104.003, Occupations Code.
 (3)  "Real estate appraisal firm" means an entity
 engaging a real estate appraiser as an owner, member, shareholder,
 partner, employee, or independent contractor to perform an
 appraisal or appraisal review.
 (4)  "Real estate appraiser" means an individual
 licensed or certified under Chapter 1103, Occupations Code.
 (b)  A person must bring suit for damages or other relief
 arising from an appraisal or appraisal review conducted by a real
 estate appraiser or appraisal firm not later than the earlier of:
 (1)  two years after the day the person knew or should
 have known the facts on which the action is based; or
 (2)  five years after the day the appraisal or
 appraisal review was completed.
 SECTION 2.  Section 16.013, Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, as added by this Act, applies only to a cause of action that
 accrues on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *