Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1372 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2021
Bill April 9, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 14, 2021
Analysis April 7, 2021
Analysis March 31, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 10, 2021
Fiscal Note May 3, 2021
Fiscal Note April 8, 2021
Fiscal Note April 6, 2021