Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1412 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 18, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 13, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 12, 2021
Fiscal Note April 25, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 12, 2021
Analysis April 26, 2021