Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1421 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 5, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 21, 2021
Analysis May 14, 2021
Analysis April 17, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 25, 2021
Fiscal Note April 18, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2021
Bill April 27, 2021