House | 05/04/2021 | Referred to Ways & Means | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 04/29/2021 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/27/2021 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/26/2021 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/18/2021 | Referred to Local Government | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |