Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1438 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 31, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 16, 2021
Analysis April 23, 2021
Analysis April 9, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 31, 2021
Fiscal Note April 21, 2021
Fiscal Note April 8, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 24, 2021
Bill April 13, 2021