Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1451 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/10/2021

                    By: Alvarado S.B. No. 1451
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2021; March 24, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 May 10, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 10, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1451 By:  Hancock


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the definition of "closing" for purposes of certain
 private activity bonds.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1372.001(3), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (3)  "Closing" means the [issuance and] delivery of a
 bond by an issuer in exchange for the required payment for the bond.
 The term includes, for a qualified residential rental project bond,
 delivery of a bond in exchange for a partial payment for the
 incremental funding of the bond in accordance with the terms of the
 bond, provided that the partial payment is not less than 10 percent
 of the required payment for the bond. The term does not include a
 delivery of a bond if expenditure of the proceeds of the bond is
 conditioned on obtaining credit enhancement in support of the bond.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *