Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1451 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 9, 2021
Fiscal Note May 1, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 7, 2021
Analysis April 30, 2021