Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1466 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 1466
22
33
44 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
55 AN ACT
66 relating to the enterprise zone program.
77 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
88 SECTION 1. Section 2303.003, Government Code, is amended by
99 amending Subdivision (7) adding Subdivisions (8-a) and (8-b) to
1010 read as follows:
1111 (7) "Qualified employee" means a person who:
1212 (A) works for a qualified business;
1313 (B) receives wages from the qualified business
1414 from which employment taxes are deducted; and
1515 (C) performs at least 50 percent of the person's
1616 service for the business at the qualified business site, performs
1717 the person's service for the business pursuant to a qualified
1818 telework arrangement for the qualified business site and resides
1919 within 50 miles of the qualified business site, or if the person
2020 engages in the transportation of goods or services, the person
2121 reports to the qualified business site and resides within 50 miles
2222 of the qualified business site.
2323 (8-a) "Qualified telework" means telework affiliated
2424 with the qualified business site and performed by an employee who is
2525 a resident of this state. The term does not include telework that
2626 occurs out of this state. To be considered qualified telework, a
2727 telework arrangement that requires more than 50 percent of work
2828 time to be completed through telework must be attributed to
2929 circumstances that do not allow the employee to work at least 50
3030 percent of the time at the qualified business site.
3131 (8-b) "Telework" means the performance of services
3232 remotely through the use of email, Internet, and telephone from a
3333 person's residence.
3434 SECTION 2. Section 2303.402(a), Government Code, is amended
3535 to read as follows:
3636 (a) A person is a qualified business if the bank, for the
3737 purpose of state benefits under this chapter, or the nominating
3838 body of a project or activity of the person under this chapter, for
3939 the purpose of local incentives, certifies that:
4040 (1) the person is engaged in or has provided
4141 substantial commitment to initiate the active conduct of a trade or
4242 business in an enterprise zone, and at least 25 percent of the
4343 person's new permanent jobs in the enterprise zone are held by:
4444 (A) residents of any enterprise zone in this
4545 state;
4646 (B) economically disadvantaged individuals; [or]
4747 (C) veterans; or
4848 (D) residents of an area in this state designated
4949 as a qualified opportunity zone under Section 1400Z-1, Internal
5050 Revenue Code of 1986.
5151 (2) the person is engaged in or has provided
5252 substantial commitment to initiate the active conduct of a trade or
5353 business in an area of this state that does not qualify as an
5454 enterprise zone, and at least 35 percent of the person's new
5555 permanent jobs at the qualified business site are held by:
5656 (A) residents of any enterprise zone in this
5757 state;
5858 (B) individuals who are economically
5959 disadvantaged; [or]
6060 (C) veterans; or
6161 (D) residents of an area in this state designated
6262 as a qualified opportunity zone under Section 1400Z-1, Internal
6363 Revenue Code of 1986.
6464 SECTION 3. Section 2303.406(h), Government Code, is amended
6565 to read as follows:
6666 (h) A state benefit may not be obtained under this chapter
6767 or Chapter 151, Tax Code, for jobs moved to a qualified business
6868 site from any other business site [from one jurisdiction in this
6969 state to another jurisdiction] in this state.
7070 SECTION 4. Section 2303.4072, Government Code, is amended
7171 to read as follows:
7272 Sec. 2303.4072. ENTERPRISE PROJECT CLAIM FOR STATE BENEFIT.
7373 (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b), a [A] person must make a
7474 claim to the comptroller for a state benefit as prescribed under
7575 this chapter and Chapter 151, Tax Code, not later than 18 months
7676 after the date on which the term of the enterprise project
7777 designation expires as provided by Section 2303.404.
7878 (b) If the enterprise project term designation expired on or
7979 after March 1, 2020, and before March 2, 2021, the person must make
8080 the claim to the comptroller under Subsection (a) not later than 20
8181 months after the date the designation expired. This subsection
8282 expires January 1, 2023.
8383 SECTION 5. Subchapter F, Chapter 2303, Government Code, is
8484 amended by adding Section 2303.409 to read as follows:
8585 Sec. 2303.409. TEMPORARY WAIVER OF EMPLOYMENT HOURS
8686 REQUIREMENT. (a) Notwithstanding any other provision of law, the
8787 minimum requirement of annual employment hours for a new permanent
8888 job or a retained job as defined by Section 2303.401 is waived for
8989 any certification or retention period that includes any period
9090 beginning March 1, 2020, and ending December 31, 2022, if the
9191 qualified business can show noncompliance was a result of the
9292 COVID-19 pandemic.
9393 (b) This section expires December 31, 2023.
9494 SECTION 6. Section 151.429, Tax Code, is amended by
9595 amending Subsection (g) and adding Subsection (g-1) to read as
9696 follows:
9797 (g) The refund provided by this section is conditioned on
9898 the enterprise project maintaining [at least] the baseline [same]
9999 level of employment of qualified employees as specified by the bank
100100 through the project's expiration [existed at the time it qualified
101101 for a refund for a period of three years from that] date. The
102102 comptroller shall [annually] certify whether that level of
103103 employment of qualified employees has been maintained. On
104104 certifying that the baseline level of employment specified by the
105105 bank [such a level] has not been maintained, the comptroller shall
106106 assess that portion of the refund attributable to any such decrease
107107 in employment, including penalty and interest from the date of the
108108 refund.
109109 (g-1) Notwithstanding Subsection (g), the level of
110110 employment of qualified employees required to be maintained by an
111111 enterprise project is waived for any period that includes any
112112 period beginning March 1, 2020, and ending December 31, 2022, if the
113113 qualified business shows that noncompliance with this requirement
114114 was due to the COVID-19 pandemic. This subsection expires January
115115 1, 2023.
116116 SECTION 7. (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of this
117117 section, the changes in law made by this Act apply only to an
118118 application for an enterprise project designation under Chapter
119119 2303, Government Code, as amended by this Act, that is submitted on
120120 or after the effective date of this Act. An application for an
121121 enterprise project designation that is submitted before the
122122 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
123123 date the application was submitted, and the former law is continued
124124 in effect for that purpose.
125125 (b) Section 2303.409, Government Code, as added by this Act,
126126 and Section 151.429(g-1), Tax Code, as added by this Act, apply to a
127127 claim for a state benefit made to the comptroller of public accounts
128128 on or after the effective date of this Act.
129129 SECTION 8. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
130130 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
131131 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
132132 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
133133 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.