Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1486 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 11, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 6, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 3, 2021

Analysis

Analysis March 30, 2021