Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB152 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 10, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 7, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 3, 2021
Bill March 25, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 3, 2021
Fiscal Note April 26, 2021
Fiscal Note March 25, 2021
Fiscal Note March 21, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 3, 2021
Analysis March 22, 2021
Analysis March 16, 2021