Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1524 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-S.B. No. 1524
1+By: Hughes, et al. S.B. No. 1524
2+ (Guillen)
23
34
5+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
46 AN ACT
57 relating to a sales and use tax refund pilot program for certain
68 persons who employ apprentices.
79 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
810 SECTION 1. Subchapter I, Chapter 151, Tax Code, is amended
911 by adding Section 151.4292 to read as follows:
1012 Sec. 151.4292. TAX REFUND PILOT PROGRAM FOR CERTAIN PERSONS
1113 WHO EMPLOY APPRENTICES. (a) In this section:
1214 (1) "Executive director" means the executive director
1315 of the Texas Workforce Commission.
1416 (2) "Qualified apprenticeship" means an
1517 apprenticeship program that is:
1618 (A) certified as an industry-recognized
1719 apprenticeship program by an entity determined to meet United
1820 States Department of Labor criteria; or
1921 (B) registered with the United States Department
2022 of Labor and qualified to receive funding provided through the
2123 Texas Workforce Commission under Chapter 133, Education Code.
2224 (b) A person is eligible for a refund in the amount and under
2325 the conditions provided by this section of the taxes paid under this
2426 chapter during a calendar year if the person is certified by the
2527 executive director under Subsection (f) and employs at least one
2628 apprentice in a qualified apprenticeship position for at least
2729 seven months during the calendar year. A person is not considered
2830 to be employed in a qualified apprenticeship position for purposes
2931 of this section:
3032 (1) after the earlier of:
3133 (A) the fourth anniversary of employment in the
3234 position; or
3335 (B) the conclusion of the term of the
3436 apprenticeship position; or
3537 (2) if the person was employed in another position by
3638 the employer immediately before beginning employment in the
3739 apprenticeship position.
3840 (c) Subject to Subsections (d) and (e), the amount of the
3941 refund for a calendar year in connection with each apprentice
4042 described by Subsection (b) is $2,500.
4143 (d) The total amount of the refund for a calendar year is
4244 equal to the lesser of:
4345 (1) the amount allowed under Subsection (c) for the
4446 calendar year for each apprentice described by Subsection (b), not
4547 to exceed the maximum number of apprentices provided by Subsection
4648 (e); or
4749 (2) the amount of sales and use taxes paid by the
4850 person during the calendar year.
4951 (e) The maximum number of apprentices in connection with
5052 whom a person may receive a refund in a calendar year is:
5153 (1) one; or
5254 (2) not more than six if at least half of the
5355 apprentices employed are:
5456 (A) foster children who have transitioned or are
5557 transitioning to independent living, as described in Section
5658 264.121, Family Code;
5759 (B) military veterans, as defined by Section
5860 55.001, Occupations Code;
5961 (C) military spouses, as defined by Section
6062 55.001, Occupations Code; or
6163 (D) women.
6264 (f) A person may not apply for a refund under this section
6365 unless the executive director certifies that the person is able to
6466 employ apprentices in qualified apprenticeships. A person must
6567 apply to the executive director to obtain certification. The
6668 executive director shall create an application form for the
6769 certification.
6870 (g) The executive director may certify not more than 100
6971 persons under Subsection (f) at any time. If the number of eligible
7072 applicants exceeds the limit provided by this subsection, the
7173 executive director shall select applicants for certification
7274 according to rules adopted under Subsection (h).
7375 (h) The executive director shall adopt rules that establish
7476 merit-based criteria for selecting persons to certify from among
7577 those who apply. The rules must require that the executive director
7678 give preference to applicants who:
7779 (1) offer qualified apprenticeships in areas of this
7880 state that are not designated as metropolitan statistical areas by
7981 the United States Office of Management and Budget; and
8082 (2) provide training and skills development in
8183 emerging or developing occupational fields.
8284 (i) The executive director shall issue a certificate to each
8385 person certified under Subsection (f). The certificate must
8486 confirm that the person is eligible to apply for a refund under this
8587 section.
8688 (j) A person must apply to the comptroller for a refund
8789 under this section. The person must include with the application
8890 the certificate issued to the person under Subsection (i) and any
8991 other information the comptroller requires.
9092 (k) Not later than September 1, 2024, the executive director
9193 shall prepare and deliver to the governor, the lieutenant governor,
9294 the speaker of the house of representatives, and the presiding
9395 officer of each legislative standing committee with primary
9496 jurisdiction over taxation a report that evaluates the effect of
9597 the pilot program on the employment outcomes and earnings of
9698 apprentices with respect to whom refunds are granted under the
9799 pilot program under this section. The report must include a
98100 recommendation regarding whether the pilot program should be
99101 continued, expanded, or terminated.
100102 (l) A person who applies for a refund under this section
101103 shall provide to the executive director information the executive
102104 director requests to prepare the report described by Subsection
103105 (k).
104106 (m) This section expires December 31, 2026.
105107 SECTION 2. A person may apply for a refund under Section
106108 151.4292, Tax Code, as added by this Act, only in connection with
107109 apprentices first employed on or after the effective date of this
108110 Act.
109111 SECTION 3. The Texas Workforce Commission and the
110112 comptroller of public accounts are required to implement this Act
111113 only if the legislature appropriates money specifically for that
112114 purpose. If the legislature does not appropriate money
113115 specifically for that purpose, the commission and the comptroller
114116 may, but are not required to, implement this Act using other
115117 appropriations available for the purpose.
116118 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect January 1, 2022.
117- ______________________________ ______________________________
118- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
119- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1524 passed the Senate on
120- April 21, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 27, Nays 4.
121- ______________________________
122- Secretary of the Senate
123- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1524 passed the House on
124- May 24, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 103, Nays 38, one
125- present not voting.
126- ______________________________
127- Chief Clerk of the House
128- Approved:
129- ______________________________
130- Date
131- ______________________________
132- Governor