Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1550 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 11, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 23, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 9, 2021
Analysis May 10, 2021
Analysis March 31, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2021
Bill April 15, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 4, 2021
Fiscal Note April 12, 2021