Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1580 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 11, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 22, 2021
Analysis May 20, 2021
Analysis April 14, 2021
Analysis March 27, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 25, 2021
Fiscal Note April 14, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021
Bill April 15, 2021